Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Santa Barbara Superior Court, filed a(n) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) (42) case against Felts, Donald Eugene, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryUnlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) (42) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time126 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
July 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: McLafferty, James William |
|
July 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Service, Filed | |
June 19, 2008 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
June 19, 2008 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
June 19, 2008 | Docket Event | OSC: Fail to Appear for Jury Duty, Filed | |
January 01, 1900 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.