Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Lanier, Michael Sharn, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Lynne R. Meredith presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2006 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Meredith, Lynne R |
|
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Meredith, Lynne R |
|
November 02, 2006 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Appear Abstract | |
November 02, 2006 | Docket Event | DMV Hold | |
November 01, 2006 | Docket Event | Civil Assessment Failure To Appear | |
October 17, 2006 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear Letter | |
October 02, 2006 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
October 02, 2006 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear | |
August 09, 2006 | Docket Event | Citation Filed | |
August 09, 2006 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.