Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Farley, Teresa filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with Steve Hermanson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 09, 2013 |
CategoryProbate - Guardianships |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Cycle Time10 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S MINUTES J GIRON: CLERK'S MINUTES 10010: JUDGE J.S. HERMANSON BAILIFF: T. BALOGH PETITIONER TERESA FARLEY IS PRESENT IN PRO PER. PETITIONER ADDRESSES THE COURT REQUESTING THE MATTER BE DROPPED FROM CALENDAR. PURSUANT TO REQUEST OF PETITIONER, MATTER IS DROPPED FROM CALENDAR AND THE MATTER SCHEDULED FOR AUGUST 15, 2013 IS VACATED. |
|
July 18, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE 7/12/13 ON STACI BELFORD: GC-210, GC-120, GC-211, GC-020 (FOR 7/19/13), GC-020 (FOR 8/15/130, AND GC-110 (P) IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of TERESA FARLEY (APPLICANT) | |
July 16, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF GC-210(P), GC-120, GC-211, GC0110(P) SERVED ON JOHN & SHERRI TAYLOR, FRANK BELFORD, AND STACI BELFORD ON 07/12/13 TERESA FARLEY (APPLICANT); | |
July 16, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING - GUARDIANSHIP OR CONSERVATORSHIP OF 07/19/13 HEARING TERESA FARLEY (APPLICANT); | |
July 16, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING - GUARDIANSHIP OR CONSERVATORSHIP- OF 08/15/13 HEARING TERESA FARLEY (APPLICANT); | |
July 12, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING COURT INVESTIGATOR | |
July 12, 2013 | Docket Event | FEE WAIVER DENIED NOTICE: PETITIONER MUST PAY $225.00 BY 07/24/13 OR FILINGS WILL BE STRICKEN. | |
July 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
FEE WAIVER DENIED-ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FEE WAIVER DENIED-ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -AS INCOME IS ABOVE SCHEDULE |
|
July 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY GUARDIAN Date: 07/19/2013 Time: 10:00 am Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. Location: DEPT 2 Result: DROPPED FROM CALENDAR
Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. |
|
July 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN OF MINOR (PERSON ONLY)-GC 70654(A) PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN OF MINOR (PERSON ONLY) - GC 70654(A) IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of TERESA FARLEY (APPLICANT) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.