Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Sauseda, Nicole, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Sauseda, Michael Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with Susan C. Harlan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 01, 2013 |
CategoryFamily - Domestic Violence |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
CALIFORNIA COURTS PROTECTIVE ORDER REGISTRY (CCPOR) UPDATED WITH FORM # ________ CALIFORNIA COURTS PROTECTIVE ORDER REGISTRY (CCPOR) UPDATED WITH FORM # DV-130 |
|
September 18, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC TRANSMISSION AND INTERAGENCY MAIL (F) FC PROOF OF SERVICE SHERIFF DV Sent on: 09/18/2014 10:20:53.27 | |
September 18, 2014 | Docket Event | RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING (CLETS-OAH) DOMESTIC VIOLENCE | |
September 18, 2014 | Docket Event | ALERT SERVED: RESTRAINED PERSON served on: 09/17/2014 For: SAUSEDA, MICHAEL ANTHONY | |
September 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S MINUTES J GIRON: CLERK'S MINUTES 10010: JUDGE J.S. HERMANSON BAILIFF: C CAMPBELL 9:17 A.M. Matter called. Petitioner/Mother, Nicole Sauseda, is present in pro per. Keith Morris is present appearing for Respondent/Father, Michael Sauseda, who is present and in custody. Dennis Brimer is present as court appointed counsel for the Minor Child. Discussion ensues regarding phone calls between Respondent and the Minor Child. Mr. Brimer addresses the court indicating the Minor does not want anymore phone contact with Father. Minor is 11 years old. Mr. Morris addresses the court. Discussion ensues regarding how to proceed, as Respondent is still incarcerated. As to the TRO (DV), there are no objections to a permanent order. Discussion ensues regarding allowing the Minor to decide to answer Father’s phone calls or not. Discussion ensues regarding the lizard. Father is admonished to not bring up the lizard with the Minor if he does talk to him. Father is not to use the lizard as a bargaining tool. 9:24 A.M. Petitioner is sworn and testifies as to the request for domestic violence restraining order. As there are no objections, court grants the restraining order as requested with the exception to allow phone calls between Father and the Minor, Dylan, if the minor chooses. Court finds the restraining order is necessary. Protected persons are Nicole Sauseda, Desiree Gonzeles and Dylan Sauseda. As to Dylan: Respondent may have phone calls every two weeks on Sundays between 5:00pm-6:00pm. Respondent understands he may call, but it is Dylan’s decision to speak with him or not. Personal conduct orders as requested. Stay away as requested with the caveat as to Dylan. Record unlawful communication granted as requested. Father is allowed supervised written contact with Dylan. Mother shall monitor the content and give to Minor if appropriate. Restraining order is in effect for 5 years. Mr. Morris will accept service on behalf of Respondent/Father. Mr. Brimer is relieved as counsel for Minor. |
|
September 05, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC TRANSMISSION AND INTERAGENCY MAIL (F) FC PROOF OF SERVICE SHERIFF DV Sent on: 09/05/2014 09:19:22.31 | |
September 05, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NEW HEARING AND ORDER ON REISSUANCE | |
September 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
CALIFORNIA COURTS PROTECTIVE ORDER REGISTRY (CCPOR) UPDATED WITH FORM # ________ CALIFORNIA COURTS PROTECTIVE ORDER REGISTRY (CCPOR) UPDATED WITH FORM # DV116 |
|
September 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
AMENDED: AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. |
|
September 04, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO CONTINUE COURT HEARING AND REISSUE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of NICOLE SAUSEDA (PETITIONER) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.