Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Vandehei, Adrienne Anne, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Vandehei, Jr, Michael Jon, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with Steve Hermanson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 20, 2013 |
CategoryFamily - Domestic Violence |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time252 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2014 | Docket Event | ALERT SERVED: RESTRAINED PERSON served on: 01/27/2014 For: VANDEHEI JR, MICHAEL JON | |
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S MINUTES D STAHL: CLERK'S MINUTES 10103: JUDGE MICHAEL SMITH PRESIDING. COURT STAFF PRESENT: BAILIFF, CHARLES RAY. PLAINTIFF IS PRESENT IN PRO PER. RESPONDENT IS PRESENT WITH COUNSEL, KENNETH FOLEY. COREY TEARPAK IS PRESENT ON BEHALF OF THE MINOR. PARTIES STIPULATE TO TERMINATE THE RESTRAINING ORDER. |
|
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TERMINATION OF RESTRAINING ORDER | |
October 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S MINUTES L WHITAKER: CLERK'S MINUTES 10091: JUDGE: DORIS L. SHOCKLEY, BAILIFF: L. MCELFISH 3:37 P.M. Matter called. Petitioner, Adrienne Van De Hei is present in pro per. Respondent, Michael Van De Hei, is present without Counsel, Kenneth Foley. Kori Tearpak is present representing the Minor, who is not present. Respondent states Mr. Foley could not be here today. Respondent requests to proceed in his absence. Petitioner requests to dismiss the temporary restraining order. Minor’s Counsel reports the grandparents have been unable to supervise the visits. Parties are getting along. Court denies Petitioner’s request to drop the restraining order. A Blank form is provided to Petitioner and she is advised to make an appointment with Operation Care. Court confirms the hearing previously scheduled for January 27, 2014 at 3:00 P.M. All current orders remain in full force and effect. Judge: DORIS L. SHOCKLEY |
|
August 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
CALIFORNIA COURTS PROTECTIVE ORDER REGISTRY (CCPOR) UPDATED WITH FORM # ________ CALIFORNIA COURTS PROTECTIVE ORDER REGISTRY (CCPOR) UPDATED WITH FORM # AMENDED DV110. |
|
August 01, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC TRANSMISSION AND INTERAGENCY MAIL OF AMENDED DV-110 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER SENT TO ACSO | |
August 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
AMENDED: AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. |
|
July 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S MINUTES J GIRON: CLERK'S MINUTES 10010: JUDGE THOMAS KOLPACOFF BAILIFF: G. HOHN 2:34 P.M. Matter called. Petitioner, Adrienne Van De Hei is present in pro per. Kenneth Foley is present representing Respondent, Michael Van De Hei, who is present. Kori Tearpak is present representing the Minor, who is not present. 2:35 P.M. Petitioner and Respondent are sworn. 2:25 P.M. Petitioner testifies. 2:38 P.M. Mr. Foley cross examines Petitioner. 2:51 P.M. Recess. 3:43 P.M. Matter recalled with all parties present as previously stated. 3:44 P.M. Ms. Tearpak cross examines Petitioner. 3:55 P.M. Re-cross examination of Petitioner by Mr. Foley. Mr. Foley calls witness, Estelle Van De Hei, Respondent’s Mother. 3:56 P.M. Witness is sworn and testifies. 4:02 P.M. Petitioner cross examines the witness. 4:04 P.M. Witness is thanked and excused. 4:05 P.M. Mr. Foley calls Respondent to testify. Respondent, previously sworn, testifies. [Exhibit A (Defendant) (DOT Drug Test Report) is marked for identification] 4:18 P.M. Ms. Tearpak cross examines Petitioner. Discussion ensues regarding case 13-CR-20849, People vs. Michael Jon Van De Hei, Jr. Court requests the case be pulled for review. Discussion ensues regarding the parties waiving conflict in order to try and reach a resolution with the court off the record. Petitioner, Mr. Foley on behalf of Defendant and Ms. Tearpak represent to the court that each waives conflict of irregularities of the court trying to reach a resolution in this matter. 4:23 P.M. In chambers conference occurs with Ms. Tearpak, Petitioner and Mr. Foley. 4:47 P.M. Matter is back on the record with all parties present as previously stated. The parties have agreed the temporary restraining order (TRO) shall remain in effect for 6 months. Amendments to the TRO are agreed and as follows: • No contact. • Stay Away remains at 100 yards with the following exception – stay away is reduced to 15 yards when the parties are at a cheer event, practice or school event for the minor child. • Neither party will make or allow any third person to make disparaging remarks of the other parent around the minor child. • Respondent/Father shall have supervised visits every 2nd, 3rd and 4th weekends each month. Weekends are defined as Friday after school through Sunday at 7:00pm. • The Paternal Grandparents will be the supervisors for Respondent/Father’s visitation. All communication and arrangements regarding supervised visitation shall be through the Paternal Grandparents, Mike or Leslie Van De Hei. • The parties will work together with the supervisors to make arrangements on weekends there is cheer. • Respondent/Father is allowed to contact the minor child by telephone 1 time per day at a reasonable hour with discretion. Petitioner is to prepare an Amended TRO (DV) and submit to court for signature. Pursuant to stipulation of the parties, Respondent’s Exhibit A is returned to Mr. Foley in open court. Declaration of Restrained Person re: Firearms is provided to and signed by Michael Van De Hei in open court, indicating he does not possess firearms. Review Hearing re: Respondent/Father’s Supervised Visits is scheduled for October 28, 2013 at 3:00pm. Further Hearing re: Request for Restraining Order (DV) is scheduled for January 27, 2014 at 3:00pm. |
|
July 30, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF RESTRAINED PERSON RE FIREARMS PROVIDED TO AND SIGNED BY MICHAEL VAN DE HEI INDICATING HE DOES NOT POSSESS FIREARMS | |
July 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (SHORT CAUSE HRG) FOR TRO (DV) Date: 01/27/2014 Time: 3:00 pm Judge: HARLAN, SUSAN C Location: DEPT 1
Judge: HARLAN, SUSAN C |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.