Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Tarnasky, Rick Dallas, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Agundez, Keith Henry, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with Steve Hermanson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 10, 2013 |
CategoryFamily - Domestic Violence |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time36 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S MINUTES L WHITAKER: CLERK'S MINUTES 10091: JUDGE: J.S. HERMANSON, BAILIFF: F. WALKER 1:43 P.M. MATTER CALLED. RESPONDENT, KEITH AGUNDEZ, IS PRESENT IN PRO PER. THERE ARE NO OTHER APPEARANCES. MATTER IS DROPPED FROM CALENDAR. TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER IS DISSOLVED BY OPERATION OF LAW. Judge: J.S. HERMANSON |
|
July 16, 2013 | Docket Event | ALERT CANCELED: RESTRAINED PERSON canceled on: 07/16/2013 For: AGUNDEZ, KEITH HENRY | |
July 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
CALIFORNIA COURTS PROTECTIVE ORDER REGISTRY (CCPOR) UPDATED WITH FORM # ________ CALIFORNIA COURTS PROTECTIVE ORDER REGISTRY (CCPOR) UPDATED WITH FORM # DV-200 |
|
July 03, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE ON 07/02/13 TO KEITH AGUNDEZ OF AMENDED MOTICE OF COURT HEARING (DV). AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (DV), DESCRIPTION OF ABUSE (DV), PROOF OF FIREARMS TURNED ON OR SOLD-BLANK, REQUEST FOR ORDER (DV), RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR RESTRAINIG ORDER - DV IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of RICK DALLAS TARNASKY (PETITIONER) | |
June 28, 2013 | Docket Event | ALERT ISSUED: RESTRAINED PERSON issued on: 06/28/2013 For: AGUNDEZ, KEITH HENRY Bond Amt: Bond Type: | |
June 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S MINUTES J GIRON: CLERK'S MINUTES 10010: JUDGE DON F. HOWARD BAILIFF: C RAY 10:36 A.M. Matter called. Petitioner, Rich Tarnasky, is present in pro per. There are no other appearances. Court finds it has no jurisdiction, as no proof of service has been submitted. Respondent is incarcerated. Court addresses Petitioner indicating Respondent must be served with the documents. Discussion ensues. Petitioner is to prepare an amended TRO (DV) and remove his girlfriend, Judy Agundez, as a protected person. The only protected persons are Petitioner and his son, Shane Tarnasky. All other orders remain in effect pending next hearing. Matter is continued to July 16, 2013 at 1:30pm for Request for TRO (DV). Petitioner to have Respondent served with amended TRO (DV) and file proof of service prior to the next hearing. |
|
June 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: The following event: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (SHORT CAUSE HRG) FOR TRO (DV) scheduled for 06/28/2013 at 10:00 am has been rescheduled as follows: Event: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (SHORT CAUSE HRG) FOR TRO (DV) Date: 07/16/2013 Time: 1:30 pm Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. Location: DEPT 2 Result: DV TRO DROPPED
Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. |
|
June 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
AMENDED: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING. |
|
June 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
AMENDED: AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. |
|
June 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
CALIFORNIA COURTS PROTECTIVE ORDER REGISTRY (CCPOR) UPDATED WITH FORM # ________ CALIFORNIA COURTS PROTECTIVE ORDER REGISTRY (CCPOR) UPDATED WITH FORM #DV-110 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.