Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Williams, Travis Daniel, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Williams, Lynn Louise, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with HERMANSON, J.S. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 22, 2013 |
CategoryFamily - Dissolution |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions203 days |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time210 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD, ATTORNEY HELEN PAGE FOR TRAIVS DANIEL WILLIAMS. HELEN PAGE (Attorney) on behalf of TRAVIS DANIEL WILLIAMS (PETITIONER) | |
May 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT - OTHER: JUDGMENT - NULLITY |
|
May 13, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - JUDGMENT FOR NULLITY ENTERED 5/13/14 WAS MAILED TO PETITIONER, TRAVIS WILLIAMS, C/O HELEN PAGE AND TO RESPONDENT, LYNN HOLMES ON 5/13/14 | |
April 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S MINUTES J GIRON: CLERK'S MINUTES 10010: JUDGE DONALD SHAVER BAILIFF: L MCELFISH 10:52 A.M. Matter called. Helen Page is present representing Petitioner, who is present. There are no other appearances. Ms. Page addresses the court indicating the parties have reached an agreement. 10:52 A.M. Petitioner is sworn and testifies as to facts of nullity pursuant to FC § 2210(d). Court finds all property issues have been resolved. Petitioner is requesting the marriage be annulled based upon fraud. Court grants the judgment for nullity as requested. Ms. Page submits the Judgment and Notice of Entry of Judgment for Nullity. Nullity is effective upon entry of judgment. |
|
March 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: The following event: FAMILY LAW MISCELLANEOUS MOTION scheduled for 03/24/2014 at 8:30 am has been rescheduled as follows: Event: FAMILY LAW COURT TRIAL - SHORT CAUSE (1-5 HRS) Date: 04/30/2014 Time: 8:30 am Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. Location: DEPT 2
Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. |
|
March 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S MINUTES J GIRON: CLERK'S MINUTES 10010: JUDGE J.S. HERMANSON BAILIFF: ER BOWERS HELEN PAGE IS PRESENT REPRESENTING PETITIONER. THERE ARE NO OTHER APPEARANCES. MS. PAGE REQUESTS TO SET THE MATTER FOR TRIAL. COURT PLACES THE MATTER ON ITS REGULAR FAMILY CALENDAR AS THE TRIAL IS ESTIMATED AT 15 MINUTES. MATTER IS CONTINUED TO APRIL 30, 2014 AT 8:30AM FOR SHORT CAUSE FAMILY LAW COURT TRIAL RE: NULLITY OF MARRIAGE. |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE TRAVIS DANIEL WILLIAMS (PETITIONER); ; HELEN PAGE (Attorney) on behalf of TRAVIS DANIEL WILLIAMS (PETITIONER); IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of TRAVIS DANIEL WILLIAMS (PETITIONER) | |
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: The following event: FAMILY LAW MISCELLANEOUS MOTION scheduled for 03/17/2014 at 8:30 am has been rescheduled as follows: Event: FAMILY LAW MISCELLANEOUS MOTION Date: 03/24/2014 Time: 8:30 am Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. Location: DEPT 2 Result: CONTINUED ON COURT'S MOTION
Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. |
|
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event | CLERK'S MINUTES 10033: 9:03 A.M. Matter called. JUDGE J S HERMANSON PRESIDING. STAFF PRESENT: BAILIFF C RAY. There are no appearances. Court finds the Notice of Limited Scope Representation filed by the petitioner on February 19, 2014 indicated a hearing day of March 24, 2014. Court continues the Hearing on Petition for Nullity of Marriage to March 24, 2014 at 8:30 A.M. in Department 2. | |
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LIMITED SCOPE REPRESENTATION HELEN PAGE FOR TRAVIS WILLIAMS HELEN PAGE (Attorney) on behalf of TRAVIS DANIEL WILLIAMS (PETITIONER) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.