Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Adams, Karie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Adams, Bill, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with ASTERLIN, ALEXANDRA presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 05, 2013 |
CategoryFamily - Dissolution |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions83 days |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time83 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 27, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
November 27, 2013 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FOR DISSOLUTION FINAL. MARITAL STATUS ENDS 3-18-14. | |
November 04, 2013 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE. IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of KARIE ADAMS (PETITIONER), BILL ADAMS (RESPONDENT) | |
November 04, 2013 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT. DEFAULT ENTERED AS REQUESTED. IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of KARIE ADAMS (PETITIONER) | |
November 04, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE, RESPONDENT'S PRELIMINARY. IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of BILL ADAMS (RESPONDENT) | |
November 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OR LEGAL SEPARATION DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION. IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of KARIE ADAMS (PETITIONER) |
|
September 17, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE, PETITIONER'S PRELIMINARY IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of KARIE ADAMS (PETITIONER) | |
September 17, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, PETITION, BLANK RESPONSE, COMPLETED AND BLANK DECLARATION UNDER UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT, COMPLETED AND BLANK DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE, COMPLETED AND BLANK INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION, BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 9/17/13 IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of KARIE ADAMS (PETITIONER) | |
September 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: FAMILY LAW CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Date: 03/17/2014 Time: 10:30 am Judge: ASTERLIN, ALEXANDRA Location: DEPT 3 Result: JUDGMENT - COURT
Judge: ASTERLIN, ALEXANDRA |
|
September 05, 2013 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH MINOR CHILD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.