Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Trevaskis, Teresa I, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Trevaskis, Jr, Richard W, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with Steve Hermanson presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 01, 2013 |
CategoryFamily - Dissolution |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions53 days |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time53 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2013 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FOR DISSOLUTION FINAL | |
August 23, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT- EFFECTIVE DATE OF TERMINATION OF MARRIAGE IS JANUARY 11, 2014 | |
August 14, 2013 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT. DEFAULT ENTERED AS REQUESTED. IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of TERESA I TREVASKIS (PETITIONER) | |
August 14, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OR LEGAL SEPARATION TERESA I TREVASKIS (PETITIONER); | |
July 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S MINUTES J GIRON: CLERK'S MINUTES 10010: JUDGE J.S. HERMANSON BAILIFF: L. MCELFISH THERE ARE NO APPEARANCES. MATTER IS DROPPED FROM CALENDAR AS THERE ARE NO APPEARANCES. |
|
July 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: PETITIONER'S OSC/MOTION FOR SPOUSAL SUPPORT Date: 07/29/2013 Time: 8:30 am Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. Location: DEPT 1 Result: DROPPED FROM CALENDAR
Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. |
|
July 15, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY PERSONAL SERVICE 7/10/13 ON RICHARD W TREVASKIS, JR: INCOME/EXPENSE DECLARATION/INFORMATION-COMPLETED, REQUEST FOR ORDER (FAMILY LAW) IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of TERESA I TREVASKIS (PETITIONER) | |
July 15, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY PERSONAL SERVICE 7/10/13 ON RICHARD W TREVASKIS, JR: NOTICE OF FAMILY LAW CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, NOTICE OF INCLUSION IN FAMILY LAW CASE MANAGEMENT PROGRAM, STANDARD RESTRAINING ORDERS-SUMMONS, SUMMONS AND PETITION IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of TERESA I TREVASKIS (PETITIONER) | |
July 01, 2013 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE Receipt: 152270 Date: 07/01/2013 | |
July 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ORDER- ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE & NOTICE OF MOTION REQUEST FOR ORDER, SPOUSAL SUPPORT. IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of TERESA I TREVASKIS (PETITIONER) Receipt: 152270 Date: 07/01/2013 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.