Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lindsey, Cassandra Renae, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Lindsey, Eric Ray, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with ASTERLIN, ALEXANDRA presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 20, 2013 |
CategoryFamily - Dissolution |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions71 days |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time300 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2014 | Docket Event | COPIES AT REQUEST OF CENTRAL SIERRA CHILD SUPPORT AGENCY | |
August 30, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION: EFFECTIVE DATE OF TERMINATION OF MARITAL STATUS IS 1/09/14 IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of CASSANDRA RENAE LINDSEY (PETITIONER) | |
August 30, 2013 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FOR DISSOLUTION FINAL IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of CASSANDRA RENAE LINDSEY (PETITIONER) | |
August 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OR LEGAL SEPARATION DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of CASSANDRA RENAE LINDSEY (PETITIONER) |
|
August 27, 2013 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT MAILED TO THE RESPONDENT ON 8/27/13. DEFAULT ENTERED AS REQUESTED ON 8/27/13. IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of CASSANDRA RENAE LINDSEY (PETITIONER) | |
July 12, 2013 | Docket Event | COPIES CASSANDRA RENAE LINDSEY (PETITIONER); | |
July 12, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE: PETITIONER'S PRELIMINARY SERVED ON OTHER PARTY BY MAIL ON 06/20/13 CASSANDRA RENAE LINDSEY (PETITIONER); | |
July 12, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, PETITION, BLANK RESPONSE, COMPLETED AND BLANK: DECLARATION UNDER UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT; DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE; SCHEDULE OF ASSESTS AND DEBTS; INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION; SERVED ON RESPONDENT BY MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT SERVICE TO AN ADDRESS OUTSIDE OF CALIFORNIA SIGNED AS RECEIVED BY ERIC LINDSEY ON 07/08/13 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT CASSANDRA RENAE LINDSEY (PETITIONER); | |
June 20, 2013 | Docket Event | FEE WAIVER GRANTED-ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) CASSANDRA RENAE LINDSEY (PETITIONER); | |
June 20, 2013 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW INTAKE FORM RECEIVED AND DESTROYED CASSANDRA RENAE LINDSEY (PETITIONER); |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.