Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Truelove, Sherrill, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Truelove, Timothy, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with Steve Hermanson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 20, 2013 |
CategoryFamily - Dissolution |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Cycle Time881 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S MINUTES L WHITAKER: CLERK'S MINUTES 10091: JUDGE: J.S. HERMANSON, BAILIFF: T. SMITH 10:25 A.M. Matter called. Respondent, Timothy Truelove, is present in pro per. Kori Tearpak is present representing the minor child/ren who are not present. There are no other appearances. Mr. Tearpak provides report regarding where the children are living, school enrollment, mother’s probation status and attempts to contact the mother. Court advises it cannot exercise jurisdiction as the children live in Arizona. Mr. Truelove is heard. 10:31 A.M. Court Reporter Pam Harris, is present to record the Court’s ruling. Court finds it took jurisdiction in 2013 based on the Petition filed by the Plaintiff and the Response filed in July 2013 by Respondent. In the Petition and Response, both parties stated they were a resident of Amador County. Respondent now states neither party was a resident of Amador County. Subsequently, both children were taken out of state to Arizona and then 1 child lived with the father and 1 child lived with the mother. Court finds it lacks jurisdiction based upon the representation of both parties. Court dismisses the petition. Ms. Tearpak is relieved as minor’s counsel. Judge: J.S. HERMANSON |
|
October 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: The following event: FAMILY LAW MISCELLANEOUS OSC/MOTION - RESPONDENT scheduled for 10/28/2015 at 8:30 am has been rescheduled as follows: Event: FAMILY LAW MISCELLANEOUS OSC/MOTION - RESPONDENT Date: 11/18/2015 Time: 8:30 am Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. Location: DEPT 2 Result: DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION
Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. |
|
October 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S MINUTES J GIRON: CLERK'S MINUTES 10010: JUDGE J.S. HERMANSON BAILIFF: C RAY 8:59 A.M. Matter called. Respondent, Timothy Truelove, is present in pro per. There are no other appearances. Respondent represents it is unknown why Petitioner is not present. Discussion ensues regarding why the minor children do not see one another. Court states it no longer has jurisdiction over the Minor who resides in Arizona now. Discussion ensues regarding jurisdiction issues as to the minor children. Father currently resides in Chico, CA; Mother currently resides in Huachuca City, AZ. Court needs to contact the Judge in Arizona regarding jurisdiction. Court appoints Kori Tearpak to represent both Minor Children, Collin and Joseph, on a temporary basis. Order of appointment is executed. Matter is continued to November 18, 2015 at 8:30am for Further Hearing re: Request for Order for Compliance with Disclosure Process and Court’s Order to Show Cause for Dismissal. |
|
October 28, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY FOR MINOR(S): KORI TEARPAK | |
October 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: The following event: FAMILY LAW MISCELLANEOUS OSC/MOTION - RESPONDENT scheduled for 10/21/2015 at 8:30 am has been rescheduled as follows: Event: FAMILY LAW MISCELLANEOUS OSC/MOTION - RESPONDENT Date: 10/28/2015 Time: 8:30 am Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. Location: DEPT 2
Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. |
|
October 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S MINUTES L WHITAKER: CLERK'S MINUTES 10091: JUDGE: J.S. HERMANSON, BAILIFF: T. SMITH 9:59 AM. Matter called. There are no appearances. Matter is continued on Court’s own motion to October 28, 2015 at 8:30 A.M. in Department 2 for Respondent’s Request for Orders for Petitioner’s Compliance with Disclosure Process and Set Trial. Judge: J.S. HERMANSON |
|
October 13, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON 9/29/2015. PARTY SERVED SHERRILL TRUELOVE COPIES OF REQUEST FOR ORDER AND BLANK RESPOSIVE DECLARATION. IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of TIMOTHY TRUELOVE (RESPONDENT) | |
October 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S MINUTES L WHITAKER: CLERK'S MINUTES 10091: JUDGE: DORIS L. SHOCKLEY, BAILIFF: T. SMITH 9:55 A.M. MATTER CALLED. RESPONDENT, TIMOTHY TRUELOVE, IS PRESENT IN PRO PER. THERE ARE NO OTHER APPEARANCES. 9 :57 A.M. Matter trailed to locate Respondent’s Proof of Service. 10 :04 A.M. Matter recalled. All parties present as previously stated. Court reviews Respondent’s Proof of Service of Request for Order and Blank Responsive Declaration and finds the proof of service is defective. Court advises Respondent to file an amended proof of service. Matter is continued to October 8, 2015 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 2 for receipt of amended proof of service and Court's Order to show Cause re: Dismissal of case. Judge: DORIS L. SHOCKLEY |
|
October 02, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON . PARTY SERVED SHERRILL TRUELOVE COIES OF REQUEST FOR ORDER AND BLANK RESPONSIVE DECLARATION IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of TIMOTHY TRUELOVE (RESPONDENT) | |
September 24, 2015 | Docket Event | FEE WAIVER GRANTED-ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of TIMOTHY TRUELOVE (RESPONDENT) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.