Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gray, Audra Lynn, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Brown, Shane Lee, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with ASTERLIN, ALEXANDRA presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 19, 2013 |
CategoryFamily - Dissolution |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions147 days |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time160 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL RECEIVED: RETURNED MAIL RECEIVED FROM SHANE LEE BROWN (NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED/UNABLE TO FORWARD) JUDGMENT AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT |
|
November 14, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT: EFFECTIVE DATE OF TERMINATION OF MARRIAGE IS JANUARY 10, 2014 | |
November 13, 2013 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FOR DISSOLUTION FINAL | |
November 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL RECEIVED: RETURNED MAIL RECEIVED FROM SHANE LEE BROWN (NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED): REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT |
|
November 01, 2013 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ENTERED AS REQUESTED AUDRA LYNN GRAY (PETITIONER); | |
September 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OR LEGAL SEPARATION DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION. IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of AUDRA LYNN GRAY (PETITIONER) |
|
September 23, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE, PETITIONER'S PRELIMINARY, FINAL. IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of AUDRA LYNN GRAY (PETITIONER) | |
July 15, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF BLANK RESPONSE-MARRIAGE, NOTICE OF INCLUSION IN FAMILY LAW CASE MANAGEMENT PROGRAM AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, SUMMONS AND PETITION SERVED ON SHANE BROWN ON 07/09/13 AUDRA LYNN GRAY (PETITIONER); | |
June 19, 2013 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED & FILED | |
June 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INCLUSION IN FAMILY LAW CASE MANAGMENT PROGRAM AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE NOTICE OF INCLUSION IN FAMILY LAW CASE MANAGEMENT PROGRAM AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.