Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Munroe, Shereen, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Payne, Jeffrey, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with Susan C. Harlan presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 11, 2013 |
CategoryFamily - Dissolution |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions259 days |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time259 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of SHEREEN MUNROE (PETITIONER) | |
February 25, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FOR DISSOLUTION FINAL - DATE MARITAL STATUS ENDS: 01/23/14 (2 PAGES) IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of SHEREEN MUNROE (PETITIONER) | |
January 22, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE SHEREEN MUNROE (PETITIONER); | |
January 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE PRELIMINARY - DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE SHEREEN MUNROE (PETITIONER); |
|
January 22, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ENTERED AS REQUESTED ON 1/22/14 | |
January 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS PROOF OF SERVICE OF DISCLOSURES SHEREEN MUNROE (PETITIONER); |
|
January 22, 2014 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OR LEGAL SEPARATION SHEREEN MUNROE (PETITIONER); | |
January 22, 2014 | Docket Event | INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION SHEREEN MUNROE (PETITIONER); | |
December 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S MINUTES J GIRON: CLERK'S MINUTES 10010: JUDGE SUSAN C. HARLAN BAILIFF: C CAMPBELL TENTATIVE RULING: MATTER IS CONTINUED TO APRIL 21, 2014 AT 10:30 A.M. Matter called. Petitioner is present in pro per. There are no other appearances. Court refers the parties to the family law facilitator for assistance. Petitioner is also referred to Central Sierra Child Support Agency (CSCSA). Matter is continued to April 21, 2014 at 10:30am for Further Family Law Case Management Conference. Petitioner is to provide notice of hearing to Respondent. |
|
December 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: FURTHER FAMILY LAW CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Date: 04/21/2014 Time: 10:30 am Judge: ASTERLIN, ALEXANDRA Location: DEPT 3 Result: JUDGMENT - COURT
Judge: ASTERLIN, ALEXANDRA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.