Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gama, Josue Ricardo, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with Steve Hermanson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 13, 2013 |
CategoryCivil - Name Change |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Case Cycle Time89 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
September 10, 2013 | Docket Event | DECREE CHANGING NAME | |
September 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S MINUTES J GIRON: CLERK'S MINUTES 10010: JUDGE J.S. HERMANSON BAILIFF: G. HOHN 12:26 P.M. Matter called. Petitioner, Josue Gama, is present in pro per. Petitioner submits proof of publication. Court finds notice has been given as required by law and there are no objections. Court grants the request for name change. Petitioner’s name is now Josue Ricardo Armendariz. Decree Changing Name is executed. |
|
September 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
RESERVED HEARING ACCEPTED The following event: HEARING RESERVED (ADD EVENT NOTE) scheduled for 09/10/2013 at 1:30 pm has been resulted as follows: Result: RESERVED HEARING ACCEPTED Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. Location: DEPT 3
Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. |
|
September 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
HEARING RESERVED (ADD EVENT NOTE) Event: HEARING RESERVED (ADD EVENT NOTE) Date: 09/10/2013 Time: 1:30 pm Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. Location: DEPT 3 Result: RESERVED HEARING ACCEPTED
Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. |
|
September 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME Date: 09/10/2013 Time: 1:30 pm Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. Location: DEPT 3 Result: NAME CHANGE GRANTED
Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. |
|
August 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: The following event: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME scheduled for 08/22/2013 at 11:00 am has been rescheduled as follows: Event: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME Date: 09/10/2013 Time: 1:30 pm Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. Location: DEPT 2
Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. |
|
August 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S MINUTES L WHITAKER: CLERK'S MINUTES 10091: JUDGE: J.S. HERMANSON, BAILIFF: T. BALOGH 12:26 P.M. Matter called. Petitioner, Josue Gama, is present in pro per. Court notes proof of publication is still not complete. Matter is continued to September 10, 2013 at 1:30 P.M for Order to Show Cause for Change of Name. Judge: J.S. HERMANSON |
|
August 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S MINUTES J GIRON: CLERK'S MINUTES 10010: JUDGE THOMAS A SMITH BAILIFF: G. HOHN 11:29 A.M. Matter called. Petitioner, Josue Gama, is present in pro per. Petitioner submits Proof of Publication to the court for review. Court finds the Proof of Publication only shows publication occurred for 3 weeks. Court explains the requirements for publication is 1 time per week for 4 consecutive weeks. Discussion ensues. Proof of Publication submitted is returned to Petitioner in open court. Court states Petitioner can either attempt proof of publication again or get an amended Proof of Publication from the newspaper if the 3 weeks of publication was an error and it was actually 4 weeks. Discussion ensues. Matter is continued to August 22, 2013 at 11:00am for Order to Show Cause for Change of Name. |
|
August 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
HEARING RESERVED (ADD EVENT NOTE) Event: HEARING RESERVED (ADD EVENT NOTE) Date: 09/10/2013 Time: 1:30 pm Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. Location: DEPT 2
Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.