Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Leoncress, Rocky Andrew, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case represented by In Pro Per, against Curiel, Luis Enrique, represented by In Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with Steve Hermanson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 07, 2013 |
CategoryCivil - Harassment |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Case Cycle Time1505 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2017 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL RECEIVED: ORDER CLOSING CASE RETURNED TO SENDER NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED, UNABLE TO FORWARD IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of LUIS ENRIQUE CURIEL (DEFENDANT) | |
October 25, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER CLOSING CASE | |
January 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S MINUTES J GIRON: CLERK'S MINUTES 10010: GARY E. RANSOM BAILIFF: L. MCELFISH PLAINTIFF IS PRESENT IN PRO PER. DEFENDANT IS PRESENT IN PRO PER. PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT ADDRESS THE COURT. PURSUANT TO REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF, MATTER IS DROPPED FROM CALENDAR. |
|
October 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
CALIFORNIA COURTS PROTECTIVE ORDER REGISTRY (CCPOR) UPDATED WITH FORM # ________ CALIFORNIA COURTS PROTECTIVE ORDER REGISTRY (CCPOR) UPDATED WITH FORM # CH-116. |
|
October 25, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE AND ORDER ON REISSUANCE | |
October 25, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF RESTRAINED PERSON RE FIREARMS LUIS ENRIQUE CURIEL (DEFENDANT); | |
October 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: The following event: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (SHORT CAUSE HRG) TRO (HARASS) scheduled for 10/25/2013 at 10:00 am has been rescheduled as follows: Event: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (SHORT CAUSE HRG) TRO (HARASS) Date: 01/06/2014 Time: 8:30 am Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. Location: DEPT 2
Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. |
|
October 25, 2013 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO CONTINUE COURT HEARING AND TO REISSUE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER ROCKY ANDREW LEONCRESS (PLAINTIFF); | |
October 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S MINUTES L WHITAKER: CLERK'S MINUTES 10091: JUDGE: J.S. HERMANSON, BAILIFF: C. RAY 12:12 P.M. MATTER CALLED. PLAINTIFF, ROCKY LEON-CRESS IS PRESENT IN PRO PER. DEFENDANT, LUIS CURIEL, IS PRESENT IN PRO PER. COURT ADDRESSES MR. CURIEL REGARDING THE POSSIBLE NEED FOR A SPANISH INTERPRETER. IN RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S INQUIRY, MR. CURIEL STATES HE DOES NOT NEED AN INTERPRETER. BOTH PARTIES ARE SWORN AND TESTIFY. COURT ADMONISHES THE PARTIES REGARDING THEIR BEHAVIOR AND THE NEED TO GET ALONG IN THE FUTURE. DECLARATION RE: FIREARMS SIGNED IN OPEN COURT. TEMPORARY ORDERS ARE REISSUED TO JANUARY 6, 2014 AT 8:30 A.M. PLAINTIFF TO PREPARE AND SUBMIT A REISSUANCE FOR THE COURT'S SIGNATURE. NO APPEARANCES ARE NECESSARY AT THE NEXT COURT DATE UNLESS PLAINTIFF FEELS THE NEED TO CONTINUE THE RESTRAINING ORDER. Judge: J.S. HERMANSON |
|
October 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE TO SHERIFF OF PROOF OF FAX AND INTERAGENCY MAILSERVICE TO SHERIFF OF CH-116 NOTICE OF NEW HEARING AND ORDER ON REISSUANCE (F) CV PROOF OF SERVICE SHERIFF HARASSMENT Sent on: 10/25/2013 16:25:05.37 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.