Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Pierce, Emily, against Bowen, Kyle, represented by In Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with Renee C. Day presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2013 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time136 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION; DISMISSAL ENTERED AS REQUESTED EMILY PIERCE (Attorney) on behalf of PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC (PLAINTIFF) | |
March 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: FIRST CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Date: 06/30/2014 Time: 2:30 pm Judge: DAY, RENEE Location: DEPT 3 Result: VACATED
Judge: DAY, RENEE |
|
January 23, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS, COMPLAINT AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS BY PERSONAL SERVICE 1/07/14 ON KYLE BOWEN EMILY PIERCE (Attorney) on behalf of PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC (PLAINTIFF) | |
December 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: FIRST CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Date: 06/30/2014 Time: 2:30 pm Judge: ASTERLIN, ALEXANDRA Location: DEPT 3
Judge: ASTERLIN, ALEXANDRA |
|
December 02, 2013 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED & FILED | |
December 02, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INCLUSION IN DELAY REDUCTION | |
December 02, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: REDUCES FILING FEES | |
December 02, 2013 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET | |
December 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
LTD COMPLAINT WITHIN SMALL CLAIMS JURISDICTIONAL LIMIT (ASSIGNEE OF RECORD) CONTRACT -LTD COMPLAINT WITHIN SMALL CLAIMS JURISDICTIONAL LIMIT (ASSIGNEE OF RECORD) Receipt: 158127 Date: 12/11/2013 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.