Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ncep Llc Assignee Of Ge Money Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kahn, Michael D, against Rainwater, Adrianne, represented by In Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with Steve Hermanson presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 04, 2013 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions483 days |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
LEVYING OFFICERS RETURN _______________________ CO ORIGINAL WRIT NOT RETURNED CCP 263.6 LEVYING OFFICERS RETURN SACRAMENTO CO ORIGINAL WRIT NOT RETURNED CCP 263.6 |
|
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT, AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST EDWARD T WEBER (Attorney) on behalf of GLCS LLC (ASSIGNEE OF RECORD) | |
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED ___________ COUNTY WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED SACRAMENTO COUNTY EDWARD T WEBER (Attorney) on behalf of GLCS LLC (ASSIGNEE OF RECORD) Receipt: 220409 Date: 07/19/2018 |
|
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT EDWARD T WEBER (Attorney) on behalf of GLCS LLC (ASSIGNEE OF RECORD); MICHAEL D KAHN (Attorney) on behalf of NCEP LLC ASSIGNEE OF GE MONEY BANK (PLAINTIFF) | |
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT MICHAEL K SIPES (Attorney) on behalf of GOLD LINE CREDIT SERVICES INC (ASSIGNEE OF RECORD); MICHAEL D KAHN (Attorney) on behalf of NCEP LLC ASSIGNEE OF GE MONEY BANK (PLAINTIFF) | |
April 01, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION / AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT (CCP 585) MICHAEL D KAHN (Attorney) on behalf of NCEP LLC ASSIGNEE OF GE MONEY BANK (PLAINTIFF) | |
April 01, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DOES 1 THROUGH 15, INCLUSIVE ONLY. ENTERED AS REQUESTED MICHAEL D KAHN (Attorney) on behalf of NCEP LLC ASSIGNEE OF GE MONEY BANK (PLAINTIFF) | |
April 01, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT. BY CLERK. ENTERED AS REQUESTED MICHAEL D KAHN (Attorney) on behalf of NCEP LLC ASSIGNEE OF GE MONEY BANK (PLAINTIFF) | |
April 01, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CIVIL. BY DEFAULT. BY CLERK IN THE AMOUNT OF $1236.51 MICHAEL D KAHN (Attorney) on behalf of NCEP LLC ASSIGNEE OF GE MONEY BANK (PLAINTIFF) | |
April 01, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF COSTS ( CCP 1033) MICHAEL D KAHN (Attorney) on behalf of NCEP LLC ASSIGNEE OF GE MONEY BANK (PLAINTIFF) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.