Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Rundquist, Andrew, against Sadberry, Donald, represented by In Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with ASTERLIN, ALEXANDRA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 13, 2013 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time105 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ==FILE BY FAX ==REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION: DISMISSAL ENTERED AS REQUESTED. ANDREW RUNDQUIST (Attorney) on behalf of PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC (PLAINTIFF) |
|
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE ANDREW RUNDQUIST (Attorney) on behalf of PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC (PLAINTIFF) | |
November 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: FIRST CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Date: 06/02/2014 Time: 2:30 pm Judge: ASTERLIN, ALEXANDRA Location: DEPT 3 Result: DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION
Judge: ASTERLIN, ALEXANDRA |
|
November 13, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INCLUSION IN DELAY REDUCTION | |
November 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT DEMAND $10K-$25K COMPLAINT FOR MONEY A. ACCOUNT STATED AMOUNT EXCEEDS $10K Receipt: 157390 Date: 11/18/2013 |
|
November 13, 2013 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET | |
November 13, 2013 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE ANDREW RUNDQUIST (Attorney) on behalf of PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC (PLAINTIFF) | |
November 13, 2013 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED & FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.