Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
First National Bank Of Omaha A National Banking, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Dunning, Donald T, against Floyd, Ronald C, represented by Gershfeld, Yana K, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with Renee C. Day presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 10, 2013 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Time To Trial193 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1827 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE DESTROYED | |
September 14, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE DONALD T DUNNING (Attorney) on behalf of FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA A NATIONAL BANKING (PLAINTIFF) | |
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ==== AMENDED====REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION. NOT ENTERED AS REQUESTED. DONALD T DUNNING (Attorney) on behalf of FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA A NATIONAL BANKING (PLAINTIFF) |
|
June 19, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL: WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION. DISMISSAL ENTERED AS REQUESTED ON 6/18/14. ATTORNEY OR PARTY WITHOUT AN ATTORNEY NOTIFIED ON 6/18/14 | |
June 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION AND ORDER (CIVIL) STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IN THE EVENT OF DEFAULT AND ORDER THEREON. DONALD T DUNNING (Attorney) on behalf of FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA A NATIONAL BANKING (PLAINTIFF) Receipt: 164400 Date: 06/10/2014 |
|
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COURT TRIAL SET Event: COURT TRIAL (CIVIL) Date: 10/07/2014 Time: 8:30 am Judge: HARLAN, SUSAN C Location: DEPT 1 Result: DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION
Judge: HARLAN, SUSAN C |
|
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S MINUTES J GIRON: CLERK'S MINUTES 10010: JUDGE PRO TEM RENEE C DAY TENTATIVE RULING: This complaint was filed on October 10, 2013. All parties have appeared. The case is At-Issue and referred to Judicial Arbitration on a 60 day delay. The parties may stipulate to mediation in lieu of arbitration. Discovery is to remain open until 30 days prior to trial. Appearances are not mandatory and the parties will receive notice of the Arbitration date by mail. This matter is continued to September 29, 2014 at 2:30 p.m. in Department 3. Should judgment enter in the interim, the hearing will be vacated. Judge Pro Tem advisement given, and there are no objections. 3:56 P.M. Matter called. Donald Dunning is present via Court Call representing Plaintiff. Yana Gershfeld is present via Court Call representing Defendant. Counsels update the court. Further Case Management Conference / Trial Setting Conference is scheduled for September 15, 2014 at 3:30pm. 1 Day Court Trial is scheduled for October 7, 2014 at 8:30am. Notice is waived. |
|
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Date: 09/15/2014 Time: 3:30 pm Judge: DAY, RENEE Location: DEPT 3 Result: ERROR
Judge: DAY, RENEE |
|
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: The following event: FIRST CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE scheduled for 04/21/2014 at 3:30 pm has been rescheduled as follows: Event: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Date: 09/15/2014 Time: 3:30 pm Judge: DAY, RENEE Location: DEPT 3 Result: DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION
Judge: DAY, RENEE |
|
April 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Date: 09/29/2014 Time: 2:30 pm Judge: DAY, RENEE Location: DEPT 3 Result: VACATED
Judge: DAY, RENEE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.