Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Family - Family case represented by Amador County District Attorney, against U.S. Currency, represented by In Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with Steve Hermanson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 17, 2013 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Cycle Time646 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT - CIVIL STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT AND ORDER FOR JUDGMENT FOR $2,100 FORFEITURE OF DEFENDANT'S PROPERTY |
|
December 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: CIVIL TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE Date: 12/12/2013 Time: 1:30 pm Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. Location: DEPT 2 Result: DROPPED FROM CALENDAR
Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. |
|
December 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S MINUTES J GIRON: CLERK'S MINUTES 10010: JUDGE J.S. HERMANSON BAILIFF: G . HOHN 5:02 P.M. Matter called. There are no appearances. Matter is dropped from calendar. |
|
November 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: The following event: CIVIL TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE scheduled for 11/18/2013 at 3:30 pm has been rescheduled as follows: Event: CIVIL TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE Date: 12/12/2013 Time: 1:30 pm Judge: GADDIS, LARRY D Location: DEPT 2 Result: REASSIGNED
Judge: GADDIS, LARRY D |
|
September 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF: NOTICE OF HEARING: PETITION FOR FORFEITURE - CIVIL TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE |
|
September 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: CIVIL TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE Date: 11/18/2013 Time: 3:30 pm Judge: ASTERLIN, ALEXANDRA Location: DEPT 3
Judge: ASTERLIN, ALEXANDRA |
|
September 17, 2013 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR FORFEITURE Attorney: AMADOR COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY (DA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.