Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Jennings, Roxanne E, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by In Pro Per, against Wells Fargo Bank Na, represented by Schneck, Margaret M, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with Dennis J. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 17, 2013 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial486 days |
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2099 | Docket Event | CONFIDENTIAL FILE FOLDER | |
July 30, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MARGARET M SCHNECK (Attorney) on behalf of WELLS FARGO BANK NA (DEFENDANT) | |
July 09, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL APARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION. ENTERED AS REQUESTED. IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of ROXANNE E JENNINGS (PLAINTIFF) | |
June 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S MINUTES BY 10120: JUDGE: DENNIS J. BUCKLEY BAILIFF: T. SMITH 10:39 A.M. MATTER CALLED. THERE ARE NO APPEARANCES. MATTER IS DROPPED FROM CALENDAR.
Judge: JUDGE: DENNIS J. BUCKLEY BAILIFF |
|
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S MINUTES J GIRON: CLERK'S MINUTES 10010: JUDGE J.S. HERMANSON BAILIFF: C. BEGBIE CT RPTR; (RECORD ONLY) P. HARRIS 9:17 A.M. Matter called. Plaintiff, Roxanne Jennings, is present in pro per. With Plaintiff is Counsel Zachary Smith (Mr. Smith does not represent Plaintiff, however is present to assist). Margaret Schneck is present representing Defendant. Court addresses the parties on how it plans to conduct the settlement conference. Discussion ensues regarding a waiver as to ex parte communication and a waiver as to conflict if court is the trial judge. Both parties waive conflict and allow Judge Hermanson to hear the settlement conference with the understanding Judge Hermanson may be the trial judge. As to ex parte communication, the parties agree that Mr. Smith can assist Plaintiff and meet with the court on behalf of Plaintiff even though he is not representing her. 9:20 A.M. In chambers conference occurs with counsels and Plaintiff. 10:44 A.M. Matter is back on the record with all parties present as previously stated. Court Reporter, P. Harris, is present for the record. Court recites the settlement agreement for the record. The minute order shall not reflect the specifics of the agreement and a copy of the court reporter’s transcript may be obtained should there be need for clarification of today’s stipulation. Plaintiff and Defendant represent they heard the agreement as stated on the record and agree to same. Matter is continued to June 26, 2015 at 10:00am for Confirmation of Settlement and Dismissal. No appearances are necessary if a dismissal has been filed. |
|
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS MOTION Date: 06/26/2015 Time: 10:00 am Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. Location: DEPT 2
Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. |
|
April 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT (CONFIDENTIAL/RECEIVED) ==== BY FAX ===MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT (CONFIDENTIAL IF NON-FAMILY LAW) MARGARET M SCHNECK (Attorney) on behalf of WELLS FARGO BANK NA (DEFENDANT) |
|
February 11, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING (CIVIL) MARGARET M SCHNECK (Attorney) on behalf of WELLS FARGO BANK NA (DEFENDANT) Receipt: 171943 Date: 02/18/2015 | |
February 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE Date: 04/24/2015 Time: 8:30 am Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. Location: DEPT 2 Result: STIPULATION
Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. |
|
February 05, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: JUDGE HOWARD TO HEAR 5 DAY CIVIL TRIAL BEGINNING 3/10/15 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.