Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Gottschalk-Hall, Jamie filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with HENSON, CAROL L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryDomestic Violence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time233 days |
ACCEPT - WILSON - STIP TO COMMISSIONER - ALL PURPOSES 04/15/2013 14:20:00 # Pages:1
Date: April 15, 2013NOTICE - RELATED CASE 12/31/2012 09:23:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00DV TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 12/31/2012 09:23:00 # Pages:5
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00DV REQUEST - RESTRAINING ORDER 12/31/2012 09:23:00 # Pages:14
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER 01/14/2013 10:27:00 # Pages:64
Date: January 14, 2013INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 01/14/2013 15:49:00 # Pages:4
Date: January 14, 2013DV NOTICE - COURT HEARING DOMESTIC VIOLENCE 12/31/2012 09:18:00 # Pages:3
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE 01/04/2013 08:17:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2013-01-04T00:00:00MINUTE ORDER 01/14/2013 08:30:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2013-01-14T00:00:00MINUTE ORDER 08/21/2013 13:30:00 # Pages:1
Date: August 21, 2013DV RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING 01/14/2013 08:37:00 # Pages:6
Date: 2013-01-14T00:00:00REPORT - PROGRESS 04/12/2013 16:11:00 # Pages:1
Date: April 12, 2013MINUTE ORDER - CONTINUANCE 04/12/2013 08:30:00 # Pages:1
Date: April 12, 2013ORDER - ATTEND ANGER MANAGEMENT PROGRAM 01/14/2013 13:33:00 # Pages:6
Date: 2013-01-14T00:00:00REPORT - PROGRESS 08/20/2013 08:27:00 # Pages:2
Date: August 20, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.