Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Landes, Robert Benton filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with HENSON, CAROL L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2012 |
CategoryDomestic Violence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time18 days |
DV TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 12/21/2012 11:27:00 # Pages:5
Date: December 21, 2012DV NOTICE - COURT HEARING DOMESTIC VIOLENCE 12/21/2012 11:26:00 # Pages:3
Date: December 21, 2012FINANCIAL STATEMENT - SIMPLIFIED 12/21/2012 11:27:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2012-12-21T00:00:00DV PROOF - PERSONAL SERVICE 12/27/2012 08:18:00 # Pages:1
Date: December 27, 2012DV REQUEST - RESTRAINING ORDER 12/21/2012 11:27:00 # Pages:9
Date: 2012-12-21T00:00:00STATEMENT - OTHER 01/08/2013 16:03:00 # Pages:11
Date: January 08, 2013NOTICE - RELATED CASE 12/21/2012 11:27:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2012-12-21T00:00:00DV ANSWER - TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 01/08/2013 11:12:00 # Pages:6
Date: January 08, 2013LETTER - OTHER 01/07/2013 11:18:00 # Pages:1
Date: January 07, 2013MINUTE ORDER 01/08/2013 08:30:00 # Pages:2
Date: January 08, 2013FINANCIAL STATEMENT - SIMPLIFIED 01/08/2013 16:03:00 # Pages:8
Date: January 08, 2013DV RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING 01/08/2013 08:35:00 # Pages:6
Date: January 08, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.