Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Soto, Soledad filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with HENSON, CAROL L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2012 |
CategoryDomestic Violence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time24 days |
DV PROOF - PERSONAL SERVICE 05/02/2012 11:17:00 # Pages:1
Date: May 02, 2012DV REQUEST - RESTRAINING ORDER 04/30/2012 08:59:00 # Pages:13
Date: 2012-04-30T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE 05/09/2012 11:38:00 # Pages:1
Date: May 09, 2012NOTICE - RELATED CASE 04/30/2012 08:59:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2012-04-30T00:00:00NOTICE - LIMITED SCOPE REPRESENTATION 05/23/2012 11:32:00 # Pages:3
Date: May 23, 2012DV TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 04/30/2012 08:58:00 # Pages:5
Date: 2012-04-30T00:00:00NOTICE - RELATED CASE 05/23/2012 16:41:00 # Pages:1
Date: May 23, 2012DECLARATION - TRANSLATOR - ORAL 04/30/2012 08:59:00 # Pages:3
Date: 2012-04-30T00:00:00DV ANSWER - TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 05/21/2012 09:34:00 # Pages:6
Date: May 21, 2012DV NOTICE - COURT HEARING DOMESTIC VIOLENCE 04/30/2012 08:58:00 # Pages:3
Date: 2012-04-30T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY 05/24/2012 14:17:00 # Pages:2
Date: May 24, 2012MINUTE ORDER 05/23/2012 08:30:00 # Pages:1
Date: May 23, 2012For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.