Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Dvp, L.P., filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Mccormack, Sandra Kuhn, against Martinez, Israel, Jr, Martinez, Israel S, Sr, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Silva, Phillip presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 15, 2012 |
Category32 Limited - Residential Under $10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2012 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: Archives mn | |
July 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Unlawful Detainer Dismissal
Judge: Silva, Phillip |
|
July 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Dismissal not entered Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason: Previosuly Dismissed 06/29/12. jy |
|
July 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Off calendar for scheduled for . | |
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed without prejudice. th Event: Dismissal filed. |
|
June 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
POS of summons & comp - subst. Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Tony Martinez, mailed on 06/19/12. Declaration of reasonable diligence and declaration of mailing. th |
|
June 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of svc on prejudge claim Proof of service on Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession filed, served on all unknown occupants th |
|
June 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
POS of summons & comp - subst. Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Tony Martinez, mailed on 06/19/12. Declaration of reasonable dligence and declaration of mailing th |
|
June 15, 2012 | Docket Event | JBSIS: New Filed | |
June 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of UD Dismissal Hrg Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 15-JUN-2012 by THOWLETT. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.