Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cantu, Emerico, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Cantu, Emerico, against Baldomino, Efrain, Lopez, Rosa Angelica, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Silva, Phillip presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 04, 2012 |
Category32 Limited - Residential Under $10,000 |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Unlawful Detainer Dismissal
Judge: Silva, Phillip |
|
July 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ filed satisfied poss only Writ of execution and return filed, satisfied as to possession only and with accrued costs of $125.00 th |
|
July 03, 2012 | Docket Event | Off calendar for scheduled for . | |
June 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Restitution of premises jgm Judgment entered pursuant to CCP 1169 for plaintiff(s) Emerico Cantu against defendant(s) Rosa Angelica Lopez and Efrain Baldomino on 06/19/12 for restitution of the premises only. th |
|
June 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ issued for restitution Writ of execution issued pursuant to PC1169 for restitution of the premises only. th |
|
June 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLSE13231. |
|
June 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Request to enter default filed. Default entered as to Rosa Angelica Lopez and Efrain Baldomino th | |
June 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
POS of summons & comp personal Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Efrain Baldomino on 06/05/12. th |
|
June 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
POS of summons & comp personal Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Rosa Angelica Lopez on 06/05/12. th |
|
June 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of svc on prejudge claim Proof of service on Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession filed, served on all unknown occupants. th |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.