Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
B. V. Randeria, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Block Dennis P. Esq, against Burton Kimberlynn Joy Aka Burton Kim, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with NORMAN P. TARLE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 10, 2012 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer/Residential (Not Drugs Or Wrongful Eviction) (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Complaint - Complaint
Date: October 10, 2012Order Determining Claim of Exemption as to Kimberly Burton; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-05-01T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 25.00 FILED BY (B.V. RANDERIA) .
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Sacramento); Filed by: County: Sacramento
Date: 2015-12-17T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 1260.00 FILED BY (B.V. RANDERIA) .
Date: 2013-03-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order)]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Other - Memo to Court Clerk Claim of Exemption Hearing; Filed by: Sheriff''s Department (Non-Party)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Monetary Distribution) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL; Filed by: Clerk; As to: KIMBERLYNN JOY BURTON (Defendant)
Date: August 13, 2020Notice of Stay Due to Covid-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL; Filed by: Clerk; As to: KIMBERLYNN JOY BURTON (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL; Filed by: Clerk; As to: KIMBERLYNN JOY BURTON (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Monetary Distribution) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 1260.00 FILED BY (B.V. RANDERIA) .
Date: 2013-03-26T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 25.00 FILED BY (B.V. RANDERIA) .
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Other - Memo to Court Clerk Claim of Exemption Hearing; Filed by: Sheriff''s Department (Non-Party)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL; Filed by: Clerk; As to: KIMBERLYNN JOY BURTON (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL; Filed by: Clerk; As to: KIMBERLYNN JOY BURTON (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 04/02/2020; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 04/29/2020; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 05/13/2020; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL; Filed by: Clerk; As to: KIMBERLYNN JOY BURTON (Defendant)
Date: August 13, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.