Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
County Of Orange, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case represented by Dcss, against Curran, Bradford, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 11, 2012 |
CategoryPaternity - Department Of Chil |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions126 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypePaternity |
|
Case Cycle Time141 days |
RESPONSE - GOVT NOTICE OF MOTION / OSC 04/05/2013 10:52:00 # Pages:5
Date: April 05, 2013SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PARENTAL OBLIGATION 12/11/2012 00:00:00 # Pages:15
Date: 2012-12-11T00:00:00INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 02/26/2013 00:00:00 # Pages:4
Date: February 26, 2013ANSWER - COMPLAINT RE PARENTAL OBLIGATION 02/05/2013 08:58:00 # Pages:2
Date: February 05, 2013MOTION - JUDGMENT 02/19/2013 14:38:00 # Pages:7
Date: February 19, 2013INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 04/05/2013 10:53:00 # Pages:5
Date: April 05, 2013MINUTES & ORDER / JUDGMENT 04/16/2013 13:30:00 # Pages:12
Date: April 16, 2013ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 05/01/2013 14:15:00 # Pages:2
Date: May 01, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.