Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Fleager, Chad Michael, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Fleager, Veronica Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryDissolution Without Child |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions136 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time144 days |
NOTICE - RELATED CASE 12/31/2012 11:17:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 02/11/2013 12:28:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2013-02-11T00:00:00SUMMONS 12/31/2012 11:16:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00NOTICE - RELATED CASE 01/04/2013 09:49:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2013-01-04T00:00:00APPEARANCE, STIPULATION & WAIVERS (CONVERSION) 05/16/2013 10:27:00 # Pages:1
Date: May 16, 2013RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 01/04/2013 10:54:00 # Pages:3
Date: 2013-01-04T00:00:00PETITION - DISSOLUTION 12/31/2012 11:16:00 # Pages:3
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 05/16/2013 10:25:00 # Pages:1
Date: May 16, 2013DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 03/01/2013 11:04:00 # Pages:1
Date: March 01, 2013NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 05/16/2013 10:25:00 # Pages:1
Date: May 16, 2013JUDGMENT 05/16/2013 10:25:00 # Pages:7
Date: May 16, 2013FINANCIAL STATEMENT - SIMPLIFIED 03/01/2013 14:58:00 # Pages:6
Date: 2013-03-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.