Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Finance And Thrift Company, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Zaragoza, Jesus, Zaragoza, Evangelina, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Suits, Martin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 23, 2012 |
Category47 Small Claims $0 - $1,500 |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minute order printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDADOCT on 30-JUL-2012 by MSIERRAS. |
|
June 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge Suits Minute Order from Dept.: 1 - Coalinga Division Clerk: R. Uribe Reporter: 13:31 Nature of Hearing: Court Trial NO PARTIES PRESENT Court orders case to remain stayed ms |
|
June 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Suits, Martin |
|
June 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
POS of summons & comp personal Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Evangelina Zaragoza on 5/9/12. ru |
|
June 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
POS of summons & comp personal Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Jesus Zaragoza on 5/9/12. ru |
|
May 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice or Order Staying Action Automatic stay caused by a fling in another court. Notice of Bankruptcy Chapter 7. ru |
|
April 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$100.00 was made on receipt CLCO6008. |
|
April 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Event: New Civil Case Filed |
|
April 23, 2012 | Docket Event | JBSIS: New Filed | |
April 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Pltf's claim personal service Plaintiff's claim given to plaintiff for personal service. ru |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.