Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Rundquist, Esq, Andrew, against Salcedo, Ricardo Bayona, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Suits, Martin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 05, 2012 |
Category09 Limited - Other Collections Under $10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Pre
Judge: Suits, Martin |
|
November 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed without prejudice. MM Event: Dismissal filed. |
|
August 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of service - not served Proof of service of Summons & Complaint filed - party Ricardo Bayona Salcedo not served. rls |
|
July 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certificate of mailing I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the Notice of Vacating of Order to Show Cause Hearing was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Firebaugh, California on 7/24/12 . Parties served: hf |
|
July 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Off calendar for OSC Due to Outlaying Court Closure hf . | |
June 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$225.00 was made on receipt CLCO6060. |
|
June 05, 2012 | Docket Event | JBSIS: New Filed | |
June 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740 Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case. |
|
June 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Affidavit in support filed Affidavit regarding venue filed. ru |
|
June 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Event: New Civil Case Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.