Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kings Credit Services, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Jolly, Tim, against Pulido, Gabriela, Pulido, Juan, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Suits, Martin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 01, 2012 |
Category09 Limited - Other Collections Under $10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 03, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of judgment-full Acknowledgement of full satisfaction of judgment filed. mmt 12/8/14 |
|
October 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Return filed Writ of execution issued 09/20/13 not returned. Final Return to Court filed, wholly satisfied. tll 12/5/14 |
|
September 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ of execution issued to the county of Fresno in the amount of $1017.64 mk. | |
September 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE317209. |
|
September 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Memo of costs after judgment Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgement of credits and declaration of accrued interest filed. Credit: $ Interest: $69.92 Costs: $110.00 MK |
|
August 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ filed wholly unsatisfied Writ of execution and return filed, wholly unsatisfied. ccZ |
|
July 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Substitution of attorney filed Substitution of attorneys filed. Old atty: Kliever New atty: Tim Jolly. JL |
|
April 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Pre
Judge: Suits, Martin |
|
March 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ of execution issued to the county of Kern in the amount of $ 914.82 . ja | |
March 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE300900. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.