Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kings Credit Services, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Sanchez, Antonio Aguirre, Salazar, Diana Fabiola, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Suits, Martin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 22, 2012 |
Category09 Limited - Other Collections Under $10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed Diana Fabiola Salazar and Antonio Aguirre Sanchez |
|
June 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ Partially Satisfied In the amount of: $1,309.84 |
|
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ of execution issued to the county of Kern in the amount of $1,148.86 . JL | |
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE333387. |
|
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Memo of costs after judgment Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgement of credits and declaration of accrued interest filed. Credit: $ 6,412.95 Interest: $ 187.98 Costs: $ 85.00 JL |
|
October 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ filed partially satisfied Writ of execution and return filed partially satisfied in the sum of $7306.72 th. |
|
September 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Substitution of attorney filed Substitution of attorneys filed. Old atty: Jennifer Lee Giuliani New atty: Maroot & Hardcastle lmi |
|
March 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Pre
Judge: Suits, Martin |
|
June 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCO6091. |
|
June 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ of execution issued to the county of Kern in the amount of $7306.72. ru |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.