Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Zinc Auto Finance, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Benavides, Walter, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Cabrera, Carlos presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCabrera, Carlos Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
Category47 Small Claims $0 - $1,500 |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice sent Docket entry for the letter produced from CDADOCT on 11-APR-2013 by ZEYANG. |
|
April 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment SC Notice of Entry of Judgment mailed on 04/11/13 to both parties. jy |
|
April 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment for Court orders judgment entered on 04/04/13. Defendant Walter Benavides shall pay plaintiff Zinc Auto Finance $3,098.30 principal and $94.00 costs, total judgment $3,192.30 on plaintiff's claim. jy |
|
April 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minute order printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 04-APR-2013 by ZEYANG. |
|
April 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Auth to Appear on Behalf Party Authorization to Appear on behalf of Zinc Auto Finance filed by Martin Sandoval on 04/04/13. jy |
|
April 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Cabrera, Carlos |
|
April 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge Cabrera Minute order from Dept: 404 Clerk: J. Yang Reporter/Tape: 9/22/26 Nature of Hearing: Court Trial Plaintiff: Martin Sandoval, Vice President Defendant: Not Present Defendant Walter Benavides shall pay Plaintiff Zinc Auto Finance $3,098.30 principal, $94.00 costs on Plaintiff's claim. jy |
|
March 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Pltf's claim served Plaintiff's claim returned to court served as to Walter Benavides on 03-10-13 and filed. Cost $44.00. mn |
|
February 21, 2013 | Docket Event | Reset hearing of 2/21/13 to 4/4/13. cc | |
February 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge Cabrera Minute order from Dept: 404 Plaintiff to report to SC counter for reset and serve to 4/04/13 at 9:00 in Dept. 404 Clerk: J. Yang Reporter/Tape: Not Recorded Nature of Hearing: Court Trial Plaintiff: Martin Sandoval, Representative Defendant: Not Served jy |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.