Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Coombs, Nathan, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Pro Se, against Sharp, Anita, Sharp, Brian, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Ikeda, Dale presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2012 |
Category47 Small Claims $0 - $1,500 |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment Issued Amount: $3,022.00 |
|
August 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration Assignment of Judgment Filed |
|
November 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
November 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order of Examination
Judge: Ikeda, Dale |
|
September 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Proof of Service OX - unserved |
|
September 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Bench warrant - unserved, defendant was not found |
|
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Application and Order for Examination Of Judgment Debtor |
|
June 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Return filed Return of (Writ issued on 08/13/13, Wholly unsatisfied) Filed |
|
August 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ of execution (SC) issued (Small Claims) Writ of execution issued to the county of Fresno in the amount of $3047.00 . lv |
|
August 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt SCCE64575. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.