Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bayless, Jodie E., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Bayless, Bryan L., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with CONVERSION, JUDGE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCONVERSION, JUDGE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryDissolution - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time140 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of entry of judgment filed. (rjc/flex 05/20/2013) | |
May 20, 2013 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: FL Judgment Scanning (rjc/flex 05/20/2013) | |
May 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Decl Serv Disc Inc & Expense Petitioner's Preliminary and Final (rjc/flex 05/20/2013) |
|
May 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Document sent to Conformed Judgment Docs SENT to BOX #2 (rjc/flex 05/20/2013) |
|
May 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Filed proof service by mail Preliminary and Final Declaration of Disclosure served on Bryan L. Bayless by mail on 02/26/13. (rjc/flex 05/20/2013) |
|
May 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Dissolution _X__ (rjc/flex 05/20/2013) Event: Decl Default Uncontested Disso |
|
May 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Fld judgmnt disso marr bfr hrg Marital Status Ends: 07/26/2013. Petitioner's former name: JODIE EILEEN NUNES restored. (rjc/flex 05/20/2013) |
|
March 06, 2013 | Docket Event | File forwarded to:FLEX for Judgment Review. Date on Shelf 3/6/13 mp 3/6/13 | |
March 05, 2013 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: FLEX for Judgment Review sms 3/5/13 | |
February 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration sms 3/5/13 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.