Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mcgee, Dolores E, filed a(n) Elder Abuse - Torts case against Miler, Michele D, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with CONVERSION, JUDGE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2012 |
CategoryElder Abuse |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeElder Abuse |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time16 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Elder Abuse Restraining Order set by ptnr 12-6967 ac 12/5/12 Judge: Nystrom-Geist, Kimberly |
|
December 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Restraining order after hrg expiration date 11/20/17 at 11:59pm tf 122012 |
|
December 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minute order Jud Nystrom-Geist Minute order from Dept: 202 Clerk: D. Hooper Reporter: C. Elfstrom Nature of Hearing: OSC EARO Petitioner: Sworn & Present Pro Per Respondent: Sworn & Present Pro Per DV Advocate Janette Miller present with Petitioner. Ms. Miler does not object to the restraining order. Court issues a restraining order for 5 years. There is sufficient facts contained in the request to issue a restraining order. This case does not involve solely financial abuse. Restrained Person: Michele Miler Protected Person: Dolores McGee Other Protected Persons: Joe Hearne Restrained person must not: Harass, attack, strike, threaten, assault, hit follow, stalk, molest, destroy personal prop, disturb the peace, keep under surveillance, or block movements. Contact by telephone, send messages, or mail or email. Take any action, directly or through other, through others, to get the addresses or location of any protected persons or of their family members, caretakers, or guardians. The person restrained must stay 100 yards away from the protected persons home, vehicle, job or workplace, other persons named in paperwork. Expires 12/20/17 at 11:59pm tf 122012 |
|
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of service filed Proof of service of Ntc of crt hrg; TRO; Rq for Elder or Dependent adult abuse restraining order; Response to req for Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining order (blk Form); Proof of Firearms Turned in or sold (blk Form) filed. Served on Michele D Miller by pers on 12/5/12. ms 12/11/12 |
|
December 06, 2012 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: DV DESK (rjc/flex 12/06/2012) | |
December 05, 2012 | Docket Event | File forwarded to:FLEX ac 12/5/12 | |
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
Petition for Protection Order ac 12/5/12 |
|
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
Temp Restr Ord-Elder/Depnd Adl Temporary Restraining Order-Elder or Dependent Adult hrg 12/20/12 @9AM in D202 ac 12/5/12 |
|
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event | JBSIS: New Filed | |
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Plaintiff(s)/Petitioner(s) in propria persona ac 12/5/12 Event: Pltf/Ptnr in Propria Persona |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.