Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Dominguez, Steve, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Rivera, Elisa, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Duncan, Ronda presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 29, 2012 |
CategoryNullity - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case comment Nullity Judgment submitted for processing. 6-14-13 ddk |
|
June 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Nullity Case cont to 6/12/2013 at 10:00am #204 - Nullity ksr 5/15/13 Judge: Duncan, Ronda |
|
June 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Comm. Duncan Family Law Minute Order from Dept: 204 at 10:00am Clerk: K Reeves Reporter: Not Reported Nature of Hearing: Nulllity Petitioner Present/Sworn/Pro per Respondent Not Present Other: The Court grants the Nullity request pursuant to Family Code 2210 (b). The Court finds that the Respondent Ms. Rivera was still legally married to Juan Gomez pursuant to 07CEFL03387. The Nullity will not be final until the Judgment for Nullity has been filed with the court. ksr 6/12/2013 |
|
June 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Cmsnr Duncan Stipulation for Commissioner Duncan to act as temporary Judge signed and filed. ksr 6/12/13 |
|
May 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration filed Declaration Petitioner filed. tm 052813 |
|
May 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of service filed Proof of service of declaration filed. Served on Elisa Rivera by mail on 052813. tm 052813 |
|
May 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Case cont to 6/12/2013 at 10:00am #204 - Nullity ksr 5/15/13 Event: Case Continued-Court |
|
May 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Nullity set by ptnr 12-6850 ab 041113 Judge: Duncan, Ronda |
|
May 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Comm. Duncan Family Law Minute Order from Dept:204 at 9:00am Clerk: K Reeves Reporter: Not Reported Nature of Hearing: Nullity Petitioner Present/Pro per Respondent Not Present Continued to 6/12/2013 at 10:00am #204 - Nullity Other: The matter is continued to allow the Petitioner to provide information to the court regarding the prior marriage of the Respondent. ksr 5/15/2013 |
|
May 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Cmsnr Duncan Stipulation for Commissioner Duncan to act as temporary Judge signed and filed. Ptnr Only ksr 5/15/13 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.