Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cach, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Ramirez, Lorena, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Gamoian, Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGamoian, Lisa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
Category09 Limited - Other Collections Under $10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Trial brief filed | |
October 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
October 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Requested by both parties with estimated time of 2 hours. Judge: Gamoian, Lisa |
|
September 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed of Trial |
|
June 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment Court trial requested by both parties with estimated time of 2 hours. |
|
June 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement Filed | |
April 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Case Management Conference CMC set for: June 6, 2016 at 9:00 AM in Rm 104 |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing In order to process this request you will need to submit PCV-10 collection case status Declaration request for case management conference. You will receive a hearing date for a Case Management Conference at which time trial dates will be set if the case is at issue. Please find enclosed form PCV-10. |
|
February 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of change of address of PATY, Mandarich Law Group, LLP . BED 02/25/15 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.