Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Federal National Mortgage, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Kim, Reuben D., against Lofton, Kimberly A., represented by Lofton, Kimberly A., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Dale Ikeda presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDale Ikeda Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
Category32 Limited - Residential Under $10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 03, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ filed satisfied poss only Writ of execution and return filed, satisfied as to possession only. |
|
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE310031. |
|
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ issued for restitution Writ of execution issued pursuant to PC1169 for restitution of the premises only. ph |
|
June 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ filed wholly unsatisfied Writ of execution and return filed, wholly unsatisfied. JL |
|
June 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment for restitution only In accordance with all evidence heard, court orders judgment entered for plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association against defendant(s) Kimberly A Lofton, an individual and All Other Occupants for restitution of the premises only signed by Judge Dale Ikeda on 06/07/13 nunc pro tunc to 05/14/13. 33521 Puma Lane, Squaw Valley, CA 93675 cs |
|
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order Received for Signature Order:order Forwarded to:401 mk |
|
May 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ issued for restitution Writ of execution issued pursuant to PC1169 for restitution of the premises only. mk |
|
May 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE307393. |
|
May 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Returned mail-no address found Copy of court trial minute order 5/14/13 returned by Post Office, no new address found for Kimberly A. Lofton . JL |
|
May 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Clerk Cert of Mailing Printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 15-MAY-2013 by CSON. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.