Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Granite State Insurance Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Sihota, Kirpal, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Ikeda, Dale presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIkeda, Dale Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management119 days |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
Category37 Unlimited - Other Contract |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions63 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time175 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order of Examination Leonard D. Lerner lp Judge: Ikeda, Dale |
|
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Off calendar for order for examination scheduled for 2/21/14 as requested by Leonard Lerner dhouston | |
January 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$60.00 was made on receipt CVCE185664. |
|
January 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order-Examination of Debtor Application and Order for Examination of Judgment Debtor or Third Person filed. Hearing set for 2-21-14 at 8:30am in Dept #401. sg |
|
October 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minute order printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 28-OCT-2013 by SRUIZ. |
|
October 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge Ikeda Minute Order from Dept.: 401 Clerk: J. Verbera (sr) Reporter: Not Recorded Nature of Hearing: Order for Examination Off calendar due to non-appearances lp |
|
October 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order of Examination
Judge: Ikeda, Dale |
|
September 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice filed Notice of continuance of order filed. sg |
|
September 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minute order printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 17-SEP-2013 by SRUIZ. |
|
September 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Clerk Cert of Mailing Printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 17-SEP-2013 by SRUIZ. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.