Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Goodwin, Grace, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Fresno Unified School District, Silva, Walter, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Snauffer, Mark presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSnauffer, Mark Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management126 days |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
Category22 Unlimited - Auto |
Time To Trial574 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time528 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Continued CRC 3.1385 | |
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Off Calendar for C225 Scheduled for 01/26/2015. Request for Dismissal entered csp | |
December 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Request for Dismissal of Entire Action of All Parties and All Causes of Action filed. Action dismissed with prejudice. csp Event: Dismissal filed. |
|
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 After Settlement | |
October 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion for continuance granted Stipulation and Order signed by Judge Snuaffer to continue 225 Dismissal Hearing from 10/20/14 to 1/26/2015 at 1:00 p.m. in Room 104 rls |
|
October 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Order for continuance of dismissal hearing is granted by Judge Snauffer. sg | |
October 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Received for Signature Order: Request to continue dismissal hearing and order Forwarded to: dept 503 le signed and forwarded to clerks office bd |
|
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Smith, Bruce |
|
July 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Smith, Bruce |
|
July 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference
Judge: Judge, Pro Tempore |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.