Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ramos, Christian, filed a(n) 43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Snauffer, Mark presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2012 |
Category43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time100 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order to Deposit Money into Blocked Account Order to deposit funds into blocked account signed by Judge Mark W. Snauffer filed. gs |
|
April 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Clerk Cert of Mailing Printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 08-APR-2013 by BJD5876. |
|
April 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minute order printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 08-APR-2013 by BJD5876. |
|
April 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order Received for Signature Order: after hrg. 03-27-13 Forwarded to: Dept. #503 gs signed and forwarded to clerks office 4-22-13 bd |
|
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order to compromise claim Order to compromise minor's claim re:Ignacio Gutierrez Ramos against Dd's Discount; Ross Stores Inc signed by Judge Mark Snauffer and filed. le |
|
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minute order - Judge Snauffer Minute Order from Dept.: 503 Clerk: B Danielson Reporter: Not reported Nature of Hearing:Petition to comp minor's claim The Court signs the Order approving compromise of disputed claim. Petitioner's counsel is instructed to submit an Order to Deposit. le |
|
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Petition - Comp Minor's Claim Marlin G Costello (Maria) 222-1188 lp Judge: Snauffer, Mark |
|
January 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Appointment guardian ad litem Petition and order for appointment of guardian ad litem appointing Ignacio Gutierrez Ramos as guardian ad litem for minor Christian Ramos signed by Judge Snauffer. dhouston |
|
December 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order granting waiver of fees Order granting waiver of court fees and costs signed by Clerk and filed. lmi |
|
December 17, 2012 | Docket Event | JBSIS: New Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.