Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ayon, Destina, Diaz, Eovani, Solis, Claudia, Solis, Robert, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Netzer, Jonathan G., against Cabusas, Mark, Marquez, Jose, represented by Allard-Bernhardt, Victoria R., Pepper, Michelle, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Snauffer, Mark presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management123 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2012 |
Category22 Unlimited - Auto |
Time To Trial613 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions89 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time852 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Civil Document Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed |
|
June 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Status Review
Judge: Ikeda, Dale |
|
April 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Receipt filed and Acknowlodgment of Order for the Deposit of money into blocked acct. |
|
April 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
April 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Continued CRC 3.1385 | |
April 13, 2015 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 After Settlement | |
April 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition for
Judge: Snauffer, Mark |
|
April 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Civil Document Minute Order Attachment tentative ruling attached |
|
April 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed to the Court: Probate Conservatorship of The Estate of Quiana L. Foster was granted. |
|
March 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition for
Judge: Snauffer, Mark |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.