Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fresno County Jury Commissioner, filed a(n) 42 Unlimited - Other Complaint (Not Specified) case against Xiong, Kou, Williams, Briana Antoinet Marie, Weaver, Aaron Nicholas, Vasquez, Judy Ann, Vang, Nhia, (total of 10) See All in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Hoff, Gary presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 03, 2012 |
Category42 Unlimited - Other Complaint (Not Specified) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time67 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Attempted service of juror OSC Service of affidavit and OSC re: juror contempt attempted but service not completed. cs |
|
February 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Juror appears/fee paid/excused Juror appears at OSC hearing, Sheriff service recovery fee paid, juror excused/disqualified. LV |
|
January 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Contempt
Judge: Hoff, Gary |
|
January 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Attempted service of juror OSC Service of affidavit and OSC re: juror contempt attempted but service not completed. cs |
|
January 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Attempted service of juror OSC Service of affidavit and OSC re: juror contempt attempted but service not completed. cs |
|
January 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Attempted service of juror OSC Service of affidavit and OSC re: juror contempt attempted but service not completed. cs |
|
December 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Juror unserved - excused/disq Service of affidavit and OSC re: juror contempt attempted but service not completed - juror had moved. Hearing off calendar. lv |
|
December 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Juror unserved - excused/disq Service of affidavit and OSC re: juror contempt attempted but service not completed - juror had moved. Hearing off calendar. cs |
|
December 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of service of juror OSC Proof of service of affidavit and OSC re: juror contempt served on Jose Luis Rodriguez by personal delivery. cs |
|
December 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Juror unserved - excused/disq Service of affidavit and OSC re: juror contempt attempted but service not completed - juror had moved. Hearing off calendar. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.