Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mastec, Inc, filed a(n) 43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) case against Eye On Your Technologies, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 29, 2012 |
Category43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions2177 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time2177 days |
Minute Order Attachment
Date: November 15, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment re: OSC Dismissal |
|
November 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Dismissal
Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Civil Document Notice of Hearing OSC-Dismissal Hearing |
|
July 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Continued Case Management Conference | |
April 02, 2013 | Docket Event | Off calendar for ccmc scheduled for 7/1/13 set in error msr . | |
November 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Petition filed Petition confirm contractual arbitration award filed. dhouston |
|
November 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Event: New Civil Case Filed |
|
November 29, 2012 | Docket Event | JBSIS: New Filed | |
November 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$435.00 was made on receipt CVCE172136. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.