Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ucp Chateau Grove, Llc A Delaware Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Insurance Company Of The West, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Black, Donald presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management133 days |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2012 |
Category37 Unlimited - Other Contract |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time2 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
June 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Funds Disbursed by Court $ 395.00 deposited with the court disbursed to: Wagner Jones Hensley check no.:140324196 kan |
|
June 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request refund to Acctg Request for refund submitted to Accounting. $395.00 filing fees- All docs show Madera Superior Court kan |
|
May 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed without prejudice. ks Event: Dismissal filed. |
|
May 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Off calendar for CMC scheduled for 9-10-12 .Dismissal filed ks | |
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Mgnt Conf Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 30-APR-2012 by CPRENDERGAST. |
|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$395.00 was made on receipt CVCE164232. |
|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event | JBSIS: New Filed | |
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Event: Civil complaint filed |
|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion csp Event: New Civil Case Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.