Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Eversoft Inc., filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against West Hollywood Newsroom Inc. Dba Newsroom Cafe, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Michael P. Vicencia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 23, 2012 |
CategorySmall Claims (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJune 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2013 | Docket Event | * EFFECTIVE 05/28/2013 | |
April 26, 2013 | Docket Event | * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE DOWNEY COURTHOUSE | |
April 26, 2013 | Docket Event | * CASE RENUMBERED FROM LB 12S00633 TO DOW12SL0633 | |
May 22, 2012 | Docket Event | AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (EVERSOFT, INC.) . MATT BURROWS | |
May 22, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM G . | |
May 22, 2012 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED. | |
May 22, 2012 | Docket Event | CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SOG , HON. MICHAEL P. VICENCIA PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING MATTHEW BURROWS . DEFENDANT APPEARING NOT . THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. ON MOTION OF PLAINTIFF. CLERK HEREBY GIVES NOTICE. | |
April 16, 2012 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (WEST HOLLYWOOD NEWSROOM, INC.) DBA (NEWSROOM CAFE) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 05/22/12 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SOG . COSTS OF $ 50.00 . | |
March 23, 2012 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN LB521500006. HEARING SET FOR 05/22/12 IN DPT. SOG. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.