Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Tolks, Arnie, against Woellmer, Danny Allen, represented by Lax, Joseph Harris, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Dandona, Jean presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2020 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedMarch 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Collections: Referred to FTB IIC | |
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Collections: Referred to FTB IIC | |
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Collections: Referred to Alliance One | |
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Delinquent - Court : FTP | |
February 09, 2011 | Docket Event | FTP Notice, Mailed | |
December 29, 2009 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
December 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Review/Request:
Judge: Dandona, Jean |
|
December 22, 2009 | Docket Event | Arrest Disposition Report, Sent | |
December 17, 2009 | Docket Event | Defense Counsel Concurred in Defendant's Plea or Admission | |
December 17, 2009 | Docket Event | Charges and Direct Consequence of Plea |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.