Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sater, Neil, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Tevis, John, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Belasco, Steven D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2008 |
CategorySmall Claims In Co 12 Or Fewer |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time51 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Clerk's Note | |
October 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Order, Filed | |
September 19, 2008 | Docket Event | Request to Make Payments, Filed | |
August 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed | |
August 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Document, Filed | |
July 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
July 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Under Submission
Judge: Belasco, Steven D |
|
July 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Hearing
Judge: Belasco, Steven D |
|
July 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Original Application (CRC 985(i)) | |
July 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Defendant's Claim & Order to Plaintiff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.